Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3003175

EP3003175 - THROMBUS REMOVAL AND INTRAVASCULAR DISTAL EMBOLIC PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sos, Thomas, A.
315 East 68th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2016/15]
Application number, filing date14804362.328.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014US39843
Priority number, dateUS201361828264P29.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361828264 P
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014193989
Date:04.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3003175
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/221
[2016/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON THROMBEN UND ZUM SCHUTZ VOR INTRAVASKULÄREN DISTALEN EMBOLIEN[2016/15]
English:THROMBUS REMOVAL AND INTRAVASCULAR DISTAL EMBOLIC PROTECTION DEVICE[2016/15]
French:EXTRACTION D'UN THROMBUS ET DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DISTAL INTRAVASCULAIRE CONTRE L'EMBOLIE[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2015National basic fee paid 
23.11.2015Search fee paid 
23.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
31.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201805   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002095171  (BELEF) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] - [0079] *;
 [Y]US2004098032  (PAPP ET AL.) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * column 8, lines 37-49 *;
 [A]US2002165576  (BOYLE ET AL.) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0043] *;
 [A]WO2007035885  (EMERGE MEDSYSTEMS, LLC) [A] 1,2,4-13 * paragraphs [0185] - [0190]; figures 10A- 10D *;
 [A]US2006229658  (STIVLAND) [A] 1,5-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004116960  (DEMOND ET AL.) [A] 1,3,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0086] *
International search[X]US2011125181  (BRADY ET AL);
 [Y]US2006229658  (STIVLAND);
 [Y]US7097440  (PAPP ET AL);
 [Y]US8083762  (KUSLEIKA ET AL);
 [A]US2012172915  (FIFER ET AL);
 [A]US2005004595  (BOYLE ET AL)
by applicantUS8377092
 US7479153
 US6494895
 US7976560
 US2012330350
 US2012330346
 US2002095171
 US2004098032
 US2002165576
 WO2007035885
 US2006229658
 US2004116960