blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3062813

EP3062813 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR STABILIZING THROMBIN ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.10.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.11.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omrix Biopharmaceuticals Ltd.
Bldg.14 Weizmann Science Park
P.O. Box 619
Rehovot 7610601 / IL
[2016/36]
Inventor(s)01 / ORR, Nadav
21 Palmach St.
Mazkeret Batia 76804000 / IL
02 / PILPEL, Yair
4 Nitzan Street
Rehovot 7655923 / IL
03 / DORON, Sivan
25 Hameyasdim St.
Moshav Arugot 7986400 / IL
 [2020/52]
Former [2016/36]01 / ORR, Nadav
21 Palmach St.
Mazkeret Batia 76804000 / IL
02 / PILPEL, Yair
21/4 Derech Yavneh
Rehovot 7636015 / IL
03 / DORON, Sivan
25Hameyasdim St.
Moshav Arugot 7986400 / IL
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/36]
Application number, filing date14805360.621.10.2014
[2016/36]
WO2014IL00056
Priority number, dateIL2013022913429.10.2013         Original published format: IL 22913413
US201361896674P29.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361896674 P
[2016/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015063753
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3062813
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3062813
Date:23.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/74, C07K7/00, C12Q1/56, A61K38/43
[2020/11]
CPC:
C12N9/6429 (EP,CN,IL,US); C12N9/96 (CN,IL); A61K38/00 (CN,IL);
A61K38/43 (EP,IL,US); A61P7/04 (EP,IL); C07K7/00 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q1/37 (CN,IL); C12Q1/56 (EP,IL,US); C12Y304/21005 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2016/36]A61K38/43, C07K7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG DER THROMBINAKTIVITÄT[2016/36]
English:COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR STABILIZING THROMBIN ACTIVITY[2016/36]
French:COMPOSÉS ET MÉTHODES POUR STABILISER L'ACTIVITÉ DE LA THROMBINE[2016/36]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2016National basic fee paid 
26.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
16.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.07.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2020Fee for grant paid
11.11.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20208584.1  / EP3808370
Opposition(s)24.09.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.10.2014
AL23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
MK23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU21.10.2014
AL23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2023/29]HU21.10.2014
AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2022/33]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2022/23]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2022/13]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2022/10]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/51]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/49]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/45]AL23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/42]CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/39]CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/36]CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/35]CZ23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/34]CZ23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/33]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/32]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/30]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
NL23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/28]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/24]FI23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/23]FI23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/22]FI23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
NO23.03.2021
Former [2021/20]FI23.12.2020
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5580560  (NICOLAISEN ELSE M [DK], et al) [X] 5,8,19 * sequence 6 * [I] 33-35;
 [XA]WO2007035143  (TROBIO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-10,15-20,29 * examples 1,A * * page 1, line 10 - page 4, line 33 * [A] 11-14,21-28,30-35;
 [XI]  - "Human Prothrombin precursor peptide, SEQ ID:1529.", Geneseq, (20090625), Database accession no. AWV25352, URL: EBI, XP002737078 [X] 1-4,6,7,9,19 * sequence . * [I] 33-35
 [A]  - KOJI SUZUKI ET AL, "A Thrombin-based Peptide Corresponding to the Sequence of the Thrombomodulin-binding Site Blocks the Procoagulant Activities of Thrombin", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,, (19911005), vol. 266, no. 28, pages 18498 - 18501, XP001317151 [A] 1-35 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PARRY MARINA A A ET AL, "Evidence for common structural changes in thrombin induced by active-site or exosite binding", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 290, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 665 - 670, XP002737079 [A] 1-35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj2900665
ExaminationWO2013036445
by applicantUS4409334
 EP0277096
 US5218088
 EP0478827
 US5831005
 US5877278
 US5977301
 US6423493
 US7351561
 WO2008157304
 US2009136474
 US8394372
    - POZZI N ET AL., "Rigidification of the autolysis loop enhances Na(+) binding to thrombin", BIOPHYS CHEM., (2011), vol. 159, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bpc.2011.04.003, pages 6 - 13, XP028280554

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bpc.2011.04.003
    - MARINO, F., "Engineering thrombin for selective specificity toward protein C and PAR1", J BIOL CHEM., (2010), vol. 285, no. 25, pages 19145 - 52
    - BAH A ET AL., "Stabilization of the E* form turns thrombin into an anticoagulant", J BIOL CHEM., (20081224), vol. 284, no. 30, pages 20034 - 40
    - YANG L, "Heparin-activated antithrombin interacts with the autolysis loop of target coagulation proteases", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 1753 - 9
    - RYDEL TJ ET AL., "Crystallographic structure of human gamma-thrombin", J BIOL CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 35, pages 22000 - 6
    - LEHNINGER, A., PRINCIPLES OF BIOCHEMISTRY
    - KRISHNASWAMY J, "The transition 'of prothrombin to thrombin", J THROMB HAEMOST., (201306), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 265 - 76
    - CHANG, JY, "The structures and proteolytic specificities of autolysed human thrombin", BIOCHEM. J., (1986), vol. 240, pages 797 - 802
    - YANG, L., "Heparin-activated antithrombin interacts with the autolysis loop of target coagulation proteases", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 1753 - 9
    - MARINO, F, "Engineering thrombin for selective specificity toward protein C and PAR1", J BIOL CHEM., (2010), vol. 285, no. 25, pages 19145 - 52
    - NGUYEN ET AL., CHEM BIOL., (2000), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 463 - 473
    - SIMON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, no. 20, pages 9367 - 9371
    - "Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis", STUART; YOUNG, Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis, Methods Enzyinol., ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1984), vol. 289
    - WENSCHUH H ET AL., "Coherent membrane supports for parallel microsynthesis and screening of bioactive peptides", BIOPOLYMERS, (2000), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1002/1097-0282(2000)55:3<188::AID-BIP20>3.0.CO;2-T, pages 188 - 206, XP002255029

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0282(2000)55:3<188::AID-BIP20>3.0.CO;2-T
    - PANSE S ET AL., "Profiling of generic -anti-phosphopeptide antibodies and kinases with peptide microarrays using radioactive and fluorescence-based assays", MOL DIVERS, (2004), vol. 8, pages 291 - 299, XP019258552
    - MASCH A ET AL., "Antibody signatures defined by high-content peptide microarray analysis", METHODS MOL BIOL, (2010), vol. 669, doi:doi:10.1007/978-1-60761-845-4_13, pages 161 - 172, XP009170505

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-60761-845-4_13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.