EP3022944 - VIEW-DRIVEN CONSUMPTION OF FRAMELESS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUSTIN, Darren Mark 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
ELMIEH, Baback 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
SWEETLAND, Douglas Paul 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
COLLINS, Brian M. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
PINKAVA, Jan J. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain, CA 94043 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14805391.1 | 18.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US47302 | Priority number, date | US201361856447P | 19.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361856447 P | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015013145 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3022944 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8541, H04N21/4725, H04N21/218, H04N21/81, H04N21/414, H04N5/232, H04N21/4728 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H04N21/21805 (EP,US);
G06T3/60 (US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4725 (EP,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,US);
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | SICHTGESTEUERTER VERBRAUCH VON RAHMENLOSEN MEDIEN | [2016/21] | English: | VIEW-DRIVEN CONSUMPTION OF FRAMELESS MEDIA | [2016/21] | French: | CONSOMMATION COMMANDÉE PAR LA VISION DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA SANS CADRE | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.06.2019 | 28.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/47] | 12.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]EP1087618 (BE HERE CORP [US]) [I] 1-11,13-20 * figures 4-7 * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 6] , [0 17] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0091] * [Y] 12; | [IY]US2004021668 (CHEVALLIER LOUIS [FR], et al) [I] 1-11,13-20 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 * [Y] 12; | [YA]US2010251101 (HAUSSECKER HORST W [US], et al) [Y] 12 * figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0058] * [A] 1-11,13-20; | [I]US2012092348 (MCCUTCHEN DAVID [US]) [I] 1-13,15-20 * figures 1, 8, 9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [00 8] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0095] *; | [XI] - S. HEYMANN ET AL, "Representation, Coding and Interactive Rendering of High-Resolution Panoramic Images and Video using MPEG-4", PROC. PANORAMIC PHOTOGRAMMETRY WORKSHOP (PPW), Berlin, Germany, (20050228), XP055034771 [X] 1-11,13,15-18 * the whole document * [I] 12,14,19,20 | [A] - Karol Kwiatek, "360° interactive storytelling", University of Glasgow, (20120927), URL: http://www.kwiatek.krakow.pl/publications/20120927_360storytelling_University_of_Glasgow_Karol_Kwiatek_PDF.pdf, (20150108), XP055160701 [A] 1-20 * page 24 - page 40 * * page 49 - page 55 * * page 64 - page 69 * |