Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3075209

EP3075209 - LIGHTING DEVICE FOR USE WITH AN ELECTRIC-MOTOR FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2016/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HILLE, Armin
Neuer Brink 10
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2016/40]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14806217.725.11.2014
[2016/40]
WO2014EP75564
Priority number, dateDE201320105360U25.11.2013         Original published format: DE 202013105360 U
[2016/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015075266
Date:28.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3075209
Date:05.10.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08, A61G7/018, A47C20/04, A47C21/00, F21V33/00, A47C31/00
[2016/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/40]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB[2016/40]
English:LIGHTING DEVICE FOR USE WITH AN ELECTRIC-MOTOR FURNITURE DRIVE[2016/40]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE DESTINÉ À UNE UTILISATION AVEC UNE COMMANDE DE MEUBLE À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2016/40]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2016National basic fee paid 
02.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/40]
10.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2008127419  (JENSEN SVEND ERIK KNUDSEN [DK]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,11 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7 [I] 8,10;
 [XYI]WO2013127952  (DEWERTOKIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9,11 * figures 3,4 * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 27 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 5 * [Y] 3,7 [I] 2,4-6,10;
 [XYI]WO2012139577  (LINAK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 1,3 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 14 * [Y] 3 [I] 2-4,8-10;
 [YA]DE202009003911U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0022] , [0027] * [A] 1,4;
 [A]US6234642  (BOKAEMPER RALF [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 13 * * column 2, line 50 - column 2, line 63 *
by applicantDE29806588U
 DE202009003911U