Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3075209 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3075209



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 192
27.09.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.09.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.09.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.09.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
27.09.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
29.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
29.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
29.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.04.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
25.02.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.02.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.01.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
30.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.01.2017 Invitation to confirm documents filed by fax Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
07.09.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
02.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.06.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 5
02.06.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.04.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.06.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
28.05.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.05.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.05.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
26.03.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.03.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
26.03.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
16.02.2015 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
16.02.2015 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
25.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
25.11.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
25.11.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
25.11.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 12
25.11.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3