Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3075209


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.02.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.01.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.09.2017 First examination report
27.01.2017 Change - extension states published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
24.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
18.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
02.09.2016 Request for examination filed published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
22.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2016 Change - representative
03.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
05.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.05.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication