Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3075209 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480063853 EP14806217



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016377273Global Dossier 29.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE202013105360 25.11.2013
WO2014EP75564 25.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105745995Global Dossier 06.07.2016A
Priority number Date
DE202013105360 25.11.2013
WO2014EP75564 25.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3075209Global Dossier 05.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE202013105360 25.11.2013
WO2014EP75564 25.11.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015075266Global Dossier 28.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE202013105360 25.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202013105360U 26.02.2015U1
Priority number Date
DE202013105360 25.11.2013