Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3066087

EP3066087 - A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF OLOPATADINE AND SYLIL INTERMEDIATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratorio Chimico Internazionale S.p.A.
Largo Donegani Guido 2
20121 Milano / IT
[2016/37]
Inventor(s)01 / FARINA, Paolo, Maria
c/o SIFAVITOR S.p.A.
Via Livelli 1
I-26852 Casaletto Lodigiano (LO) / IT
02 / RODRIGUEZ CURIEL, Renè, Ignacio
c/o Derivados Quimicos S.A.
Camino Viejo de Pliego s/n
E-30820 Alcantarilla / ES
03 / MAIORANA, Stefano
Via A. Deffenu 7
I-20133 Milano (MI) / IT
04 / BIANCHI, Aldo
Via Manzoni 5A
I-20020 Solaro (MI) / IT
 [2016/37]
Representative(s)Trupiano, Federica
Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
[2016/37]
Application number, filing date14806406.604.11.2014
[2016/37]
WO2014IB02331
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0182004.11.2013         Original published format: IT MI20131820
[2016/37]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015063579
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3066087
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2016/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3066087
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D313/12, C07F7/18
[2016/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OLOPATADIN UND SYLIL-ZWISCHENPRODUKTE DAVON[2016/37]
English:A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF OLOPATADINE AND SYLIL INTERMEDIATES THEREOF[2016/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'OLOPATADINE ET INTERMÉDIAIRES SILYLÉS DE CELLE-CI[2016/37]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2016National basic fee paid 
01.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/37]
29.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2017Fee for grant paid
08.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.11.2014
AT18.10.2017
CY18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
MK18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE04.11.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU04.11.2014
AT18.10.2017
CY18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE04.11.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2019/31]HU04.11.2014
AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE04.11.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE04.11.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE04.11.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE04.11.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU04.11.2017
MT04.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU04.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/38]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU04.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/36]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007119120  (MEDICHEM SA [ES]; BENITO MONICA [ES]; MOLINS ELIES [ES]; CHAMORRO IOLA) [Y] 1-14 * examples 1, 3, 9 * * claims 32-42 *;
 [Y]WO2011128911  (MSN LAB LTD [IN]; SATYANARAYANA REDDY MANNE [IN]; ESWARAIAH SAJJA [IN]) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-11 * * examples 1, 3, 5-8 *;
 [Y]WO2007110761  (AZAD PHARMACEUTICAL INGREDIENT [CH]; BADER THOMAS [CH]; BICHSEL HANS-U) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-22 * * example 6 *;
 [Y]WO9529182  (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]; ASCHER GERD [AT]; LUDESCHER JOHANNES [AT]; STURM) [Y] 1-14 * page 24, line 27 - page 27, line 27 * * claim 6 *;
 [Y]EP2145882  (RAGACTIVES S L U [ES] CRYSTAL PHARMA S A U [ES]) [Y] 1-14 * page 10, paragraph 70 - page 12, paragraph 82 * * claims 1-15 *
by applicantWO2010007056
 WO2010121877