Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3004629

EP3004629 - SHUT-OFF VALVE FOR OSCILLATING WATER COLUMN TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dresser Rand Company
500 Paul Clark Drive
Olean, NY 14760 / US
[2017/18]
Former [2016/15]For all designated states
Dresser-Rand Company Ltd.
Werrington Parkway
Peterborough
Cambridgeshire PE4 5HG / GB
For all designated states
Hall, Russell
19 Horsegate
Deeping St. James
Peterborough PE6 8EN / GB
For all designated states
Natanzi, Shahab
8 Chartwell Close
Fletton
Peterborough PE2 9BE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, Russell
19 Horsegate
Deeping St. James
Peterborough PE6 8EN / GB
02 / NATANZI, Shahab
8 Normanby Chase
Altrincham
Cheshire WA14 4QP / GB
 [2016/37]
Former [2016/15]01 / HALL, Russell
19 Horsegate
Deeping St. James
Peterborough PE6 8EN / GB
02 / NATANZI, Shahab
8 Chartwell Close
Fletton
Peterborough PE2 9BE / GB
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/19]Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2016/15]Dowling, Andrew
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date14806939.627.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014US39517
Priority number, dateUS201361830541P03.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361830541 P
US20141428566423.05.2014         Original published format: US201414285664
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014197234
Date:11.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3004629
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014
[2016/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3004629
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/12, F03B15/00, F03B13/14, F03B11/00
[2017/02]
Former International [2016/15]F03B13/12, F03B15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSPERRVENTIL FÜR TURBINEN MIT SCHWINGENDEN WASSERSÄULEN[2016/15]
English:SHUT-OFF VALVE FOR OSCILLATING WATER COLUMN TURBINES[2016/15]
French:SOUPAPE D'ARRÊT POUR TURBINES DE COLONNES D'EAU OSCILLANTE[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2015National basic fee paid 
19.11.2015Search fee paid 
19.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
25.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2019Fee for grant paid
27.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
BG08.08.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
Former [2019/49]AL08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Former [2019/48]FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Former [2019/47]FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010209236  (FREEMAN CHRISTOPHER [GB] ET AL) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0044] - [0049] * * figures 1,3-9 *;
 [Y]US2009097966  (MCCAFFREY MICHAEL G [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0018] - [0021] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US8286425  (MAIER WILLIAM C [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 61 - column 7, line 48 * * figures 3-6 *;
 [A]JP2011074854  (TOYO SEKKEI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2010209236  (FREEMAN et al.) [Y] 1-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0044]-[0049], claim 23, and figures 1-4. *;
 [Y]US6820333  (SHIMMEI et al.) [Y] 1-20 * See column 2, line 32 - column 6, line 10; and figures 7-8,11. *;
 [A]US7471009  (DAVIS et al.) [A] 1-20 * See column 9, lines 25-28 and figure 15. *;
 [A]EP2538070  (INSTITUTO SUPERIOR TCNICO) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0014] and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]JP2011074854  (TOYO SEKKEI KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0060] and figures 4-6. *