Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3004629 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3004629



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 250
20.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
19.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
10.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
25.04.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
25.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
25.04.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
25.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
23.03.2017 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
14.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
05.01.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
12.12.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
23.11.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.03.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.02.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.01.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
08.12.2015 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
19.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
16.10.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.04.2015 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
11.12.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26