Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2971681

EP2971681 - TURBOFAN ENGINE ASSEMBLY METHODS AND TURBOFAN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/03]TURBOFAN ENGINE ASSEMBLY METHODS
[2018/31]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COFFIN, James, B.
35 Hobson Avenue
Windsor, CT 06095 / US
02 / PESCOSOLIDO, Alessio
594D Mountain Road
West Hartford, CT 06117 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2019/41]
Former [2016/03]Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date14807536.914.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US27512
Priority number, dateUS201361786087P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361786087 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014197080
Date:11.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2971681
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2971681
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:F02C7/36, F01D25/28, F01D25/16, F02K3/06
[2016/50]
Former International [2016/03]F02C7/20, F02C7/06, F01D25/28, F01D25/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES TURBOFANMOTORS UND TURBOFANMOTOR[2018/31]
English:TURBOFAN ENGINE ASSEMBLY METHODS AND TURBOFAN ENGINE[2018/31]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MOTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX ET MOTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX[2018/31]
Former [2016/03]VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES TURBOLÜFTERMOTORS
Former [2016/03]TURBOFAN ENGINE ASSEMBLY METHODS
Former [2016/03]PROCÉDÉS D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MOTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Search fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
09.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
26.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2019Fee for grant paid
27.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19167955.4  / EP3546726
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
26.03.2019Request for further processing filed
26.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.04.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2535528  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-5,8-11,13,15 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0053] *;
 [I]US2012251306  (REINHARDT GREGORY E [US], et al) [I] 1-5,8-11,13,15 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]EP2390472  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2012195753  (DAVIS TODD A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 *
International search[X]US2012257960  (REINHARDT GREGORY E [US], et al);
 [A]US2008098717  (ORLANDO ROBERT JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [A]US2011123326  (DIBENEDETTO ENZO [US], et al);
 [A]US2011056208  (NORRIS JAMES W [US], et al);
 [A]US7955046  (MCCUNE MICHAEL E [US], et al)
by applicantUS8439637
 US8511987
 US7955046
 US7795540
 US5653351
 US7568575
 EP2535528
 US2012251306