Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3004985

EP3004985 - MICROSCOPE OBSERVATION TUBE SMART-PHONE ADAPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Iridex Corporation
1212 Terra Bella Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / COPPAGE, Aaron
1212 Terra Bella Avenue
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
02 / FERNANDEZ, Alexander
1212 Terra Bella Avenue
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2016/15]
Application number, filing date14808008.809.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014US37528
Priority number, dateUS201361831433P05.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361831433 P
US20131401985806.09.2013         Original published format: US201314019858
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014197166
Date:11.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3004985
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:G03B17/00, G03B17/48, G02B21/36, G02B21/00, G02B23/16, G03B17/14, G03B17/56, H04N5/225
[2017/02]
Former International [2016/15]G03B17/00, G03B17/48, G02B21/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
TitleGerman:SMARTPHONE-ADAPTER FÜR EINEN MIKROSKOP-EINBLICKTUBUS[2016/15]
English:MICROSCOPE OBSERVATION TUBE SMART-PHONE ADAPTOR[2016/15]
French:ADAPTATEUR D'ORDIPHONE POUR TUBE D'OBSERVATION DE MICROSCOPE[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2015National basic fee paid 
15.12.2015Search fee paid 
15.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
14.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/02]
24.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013016963  (MILLER ANDREW [US]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037]; figure 8 * [I] 2-9,11;
 [A]US2013100271  (HOWES ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-14 *;
 [A]US2009109533  (LAGANAS MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0142]; figures 1-47 *;
 [A]US6357937  (STRATTON JR JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-4 *
International search[XY]US2013016963  (MILLER, A.);) [X] 1-4, 6-12, 14-16 * ; figures 1, 5, and 7; paragraphs [0022]-[0023], [0026]-[0028], and [0037]). * [Y] 5, 13, 17-20;
 [Y]US4504129  (VAN IDERSTINE, R.);) [Y] 5, 13, 17-20 * ; figure 4; column 8, lines 8-19. *;
 [A]US2013100271  (HOWES, A.);) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document. *