Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3004985 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3004985



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
20.12.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
08.12.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.11.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
16.03.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
15.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.10.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
11.12.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 14