Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3004985


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.12.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
23.08.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
12.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.12.2016 Supplementary search report published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
09.12.2016 Change - classification published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
09.12.2016 Change - classification published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
12.08.2016 Change - extension states published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
13.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
11.03.2016 Request for examination filed published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
03.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
15.12.2015 Change - representative
15.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
19.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication