Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3004985 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480031984 EP14808008



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9857666Global Dossier 02.01.2018B2
US2016202464 14.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201314019858 06.09.2013
US201514961469 07.12.2015
WO2014US37528 09.05.2014
US201361831433 05.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2016521869Global Dossier 25.07.2016A
Priority number Date
US201314019858 06.09.2013
WO2014US37528 09.05.2014
US201361831433 05.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105264435Global Dossier 20.01.2016A
Priority number Date
US201314019858 06.09.2013
WO2014US37528 09.05.2014
US201361831433 05.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3004985Global Dossier 11.01.2017A4
EP3004985 13.04.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201314019858 06.09.2013
WO2014US37528 09.05.2014
US201361831433 05.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014197166Global Dossier 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314019858 06.09.2013
US201361831433 05.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9122131Global Dossier 01.09.2015B2
US2014362283 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314019858 06.09.2013
US201361831433 05.06.2013