Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3006537

EP3006537 - DEGRADABLE FIBER FOR USE IN WELLBORE TREATMENT FLUID, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND WELLBORE TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kureha Corporation
3-3-2, Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8552 / JP
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI Takeo
c/o Kureha Corporation
3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8552 / JP
02 / SAIJO Hikaru
c/o Kureha Corporation
3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8552 / JP
03 / SAITO Mizuki
c/o Kureha Corporation
3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8552 / JP
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2016/15]BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14808150.830.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014JP64456
Priority number, dateJP2013011671203.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013116712
[2016/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014196474
Date:11.12.2014
Language:JA
[2014/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3006537
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3006537
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/62, E21B43/26, C09K8/035, D01F6/92, D01F8/14, // D01D5/34
[2019/09]
Former International [2017/18]D01F6/62, E21B43/26, C09K8/035
Former International [2016/15]C09K8/12, D01F6/62, E21B43/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABBAUBARE FASER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BOHRLOCHBEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND BOHRLOCHBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN[2016/15]
English:DEGRADABLE FIBER FOR USE IN WELLBORE TREATMENT FLUID, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND WELLBORE TREATMENT METHOD[2016/15]
French:FIBRES DÉGRADABLES POUR FLUIDE DE TRAITEMENT DE CHEMINÉE DE MINERAI AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLES-CI, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CHEMINÉE DE MINERAI[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2015Translation filed 
02.12.2015National basic fee paid 
02.12.2015Search fee paid 
02.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
03.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2019Fee for grant paid
02.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2011165370  (KIMURA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-11 * example 48 * * paragraphs [0213] - [0214] - [ 0314] - [0317] * * paragraphs [0002] , [0074] - [0076] * [A] 2,7,12-21;
 [XA]US7445841  (KAIJIYAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,11 * examples 5-1,5-2,5-3 * * claims 1-6 * * column 3, lines 40-50 * * column 28, lines 20-35 * * column 23, lines 57-67 * * columns 45-48 * [A] 2,4,5,7,9,10,12-21;
 [AD]US7833950  (WILLBERG DEAN M [RU], et al) [AD] 1-21 * claims 1-19 *
International search[A]WO2011016321  ;
 [A]WO2012050187  ;
 [A]JP2012251277  ;
 [A]WO2012082521  ;
 [A]WO2012082517
ExaminationWO2012050187
by applicantJP2003533619
 US6849582
 US7581590
 US7833950
 US7380601