Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3073981

EP3073981 - BEVERAGE CARTRIDGE CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL ACTIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2019/30]
Former [2016/40]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TROMBLEY, Kurt, Franklin
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2019/30]
Former [2016/40]01 / TROMBLEY, Kurt, Franklin
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/30]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2016/40]Engisch, Gautier , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date14809262.026.11.2014
[2016/40]
WO2014US67518
Priority number, dateUS201361909556P27.11.2013         Original published format: US 201361909556 P
[2016/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015081145
Date:04.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3073981
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015
[2016/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3073981
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/14, A61J1/20, A61J3/00, B65D85/804
[2016/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GETRÄNKEPATRONE MIT PHARMAZEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFEN[2016/40]
English:BEVERAGE CARTRIDGE CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL ACTIVES[2016/40]
French:CARTOUCHE DE BOISSON CONTENANT DES ACTIFS PHARMACEUTIQUES[2016/40]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2016National basic fee paid 
05.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/40]
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.12.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2019Fee for grant paid
12.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2013144838  (SARONG SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,11,13-18 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 12 * * page 9, line 22 - line 33 * * figures 2,8 * [I] 12,19,20;
 [X]US2011151075  (PETERSON PETER [US]) [X] 1,3-5,11,13-18 * paragraphs [0029] , [0032]; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP2154101  (MDS GLOBAL HOLDING LTD [MT]) [X] 1,6,8-11,13-18 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0096]; figures 16-19 *;
 [X]EP2551216  (CAVONIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,11,13-18 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0018]; figure 1a *;
 [X]US2013129870  (NOVAK THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8-11,13-18 * paragraphs [0113] , [0125] , [0128]; figure 11 *;
 [XP]WO2014127467  (2266170 ONTARIO INC [CA]) [XP] 1-3,11-18 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0031] , [0032] , [0033] , [0056]; figures 2,4 *