EP3080173 - COPOLYMERS COMPRISING CROSSLINKABLE PROTOGENIC GROUPS WHICH CAN BE USED TO CONSTITUTE FUEL CELL MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUVAT, Pierrick 47 bis rue de Monts F-37250 Montbazon / FR | 02 /
BIGARRE, Janick 106 rue de la Fuye F-37000 Tours / FR | 03 /
SOUQUET-GRUMEY, Julien 42 rue de la cité St Pierre F-86000 Poitiers / FR | 04 /
DAVID, Ghislain 267 Avenue des Frères Buhler F-34080 Montpellier / FR | 05 /
LABALME, Etienne 38 rue du Colonel Bourasse F-30390 Aramon / FR | 06 /
LOUBAT, Cédric 13 rue des Lavandins F-34740 Vendargues / FR | 07 /
BOUTEVIN, Gilles 198 rue Arbousier F-34980 St Clement de Riviere / FR | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14809871.8 | 11.12.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014EP77354 | Priority number, date | FR20130062634 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1362634 | [2016/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086736 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080173 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080173 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/24, H01M8/10, C08F216/14 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
C08F214/247 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1034 (US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1072 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F214/247, C08F230/02, C08F216/1475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE MIT VERNETZBAREN PROTOGENEN GRUPPEN FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFZELLMEMBRANEN | [2016/42] | English: | COPOLYMERS COMPRISING CROSSLINKABLE PROTOGENIC GROUPS WHICH CAN BE USED TO CONSTITUTE FUEL CELL MEMBRANES | [2016/42] | French: | COPOLYMERES COMPRENANT DES GROUPES PROTOGENES RETICULABLES UTILISABLES POUR CONSTITUER DES MEMBRANES DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2014 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | MT | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | IE | 11.12.2017 | LU | 11.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 18.10.2017 | |
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9936381 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-12* page 9, lines 10-12; claim 17 *; | [A]FR2843398 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 1 * * page 4, lines 14-29 * * page 7, lines 8-17 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 11 *; | [A]US2011082312 (IGNATYEV NIKOLAI MYKOLA [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * example 23a *; | [A]WO2011048076 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * pages 1-3 * * page 7, lines 1-11 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 10 * * examples 1-6 * |