Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3007829

EP3007829 - SHOWERHEAD WITH TURBINE DRIVEN SHUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Water Pik, Inc.
1730 East Prospect Road
Fort Collins, CO 80553-0001 / US
[2016/16]
Inventor(s)01 / QUINN, Michael J.
1425 Redwood Drive
Windsor, Colorado 80550 / US
02 / CACKA, Joseph W.
204 East Iowa Avenue
Berthoud, Colorado 80513 / US
03 / LEBER, Leland C.
5257 Fox Hills Drive
Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 / US
 [2016/16]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/08]
Former [2016/16]Lloyd, Robin
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14811150.313.06.2014
[2016/16]
WO2014US42410
Priority number, dateUS201361834816P13.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361834816 P
[2016/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014201420
Date:18.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3007829
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014
[2016/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3007829
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:B05B1/18, B05B1/16, E03C1/04, B05B3/04
[2017/08]
Former International [2016/16]B05B1/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DUSCHKOPF MIT TURBINENANGETRIEBENEM VERSCHLUSS[2016/16]
English:SHOWERHEAD WITH TURBINE DRIVEN SHUTTER[2016/16]
French:POMME DE DOUCHE AYANT UN MÉCANISME D'OBTURATION ENTRAÎNÉ PAR TURBINE[2016/16]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2015National basic fee paid 
11.12.2015Search fee paid 
11.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/16]
15.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2019Fee for grant paid
07.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19157091.0  / EP3513878
EP19157114.0  / EP3513879
Opposition(s)21.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
MC20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2020/03]AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/52]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/51]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN201940296U  (QUANSEN HU) [X] 1-8,10,12,15 * abstract * [I] 9,11,13,14;
 [A]DE10034818  (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US8366024  (LEBER LELAND C [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US4398669  (FIENHOLD STEPHEN C [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[X]US4398669  (FIENHOLD STEPHEN C [US]);
 [X]US4190207  (CAMMACK MICHAEL A [US], et al);
 [Y]US8297534  (LI RENZHONG [CN], et al);
 [Y]US8220726  (QIU JIASEN [CN], et al);
 [A]US8366024  (LEBER LELAND C [US]);
 [A]US2013126646  (WU WEI-SHENG [TW])
by applicantCN201940296U