Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3084107

EP3084107 - DAMPING UNIT FOR A SLIDING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / HOFFMANN, Andreas
Elsemühlenweg 41a
32257 Bünde / DE
02 / GEBHARDT, Björn
Ennigerloherstrasse 59
59302 Oelde / DE
 [2019/42]
Former [2016/43]01 / HOFFMANN, Andreas
Elsemühlenweg 43
32257 Bünde / DE
02 / GEBHARDT, Björn
Ennigerloherstrasse 59
59302 Oelde / DE
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/43]
Application number, filing date14811843.310.12.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014EP77109
Priority number, dateDE20131011430918.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013114309
[2016/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015091118
Date:25.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3084107
Date:26.10.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3084107
Date:19.02.2020
Language:DE
[2020/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:E05F5/00, E05F1/16
[2016/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG FÜR EIN SCHIEBEELEMENT[2019/47]
English:DAMPING UNIT FOR A SLIDING ELEMENT[2016/43]
French:UNITÉ DE RENTRÉE ET D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR UN ÉLÉMENT COULISSANT[2016/43]
Former [2016/43]EINZUGS- UND DÄMPFUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN SCHIEBEELEMENT
Entry into regional phase02.06.2016National basic fee paid 
02.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
06.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2019Fee for grant paid
16.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]WO2013039269  (SAMWOO CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-5 * [A] 8,11,13,14 [Y] 9,10 [I] 5-7;
 [X]US2013088132  (HAMMERLE HERMANN [AT]) [X] 1-3,12 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]WO2008071168  (ZIMMER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10 * figure 2 *
by applicantDE202005014050U
 DE102008009046