Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3194184

EP3194184 - TRANSMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS TRANSMISSION OF MEASURED PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STE Industries s.r.l.
Via Leonardo Bistolfi, 49
20134 Milano / IT
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / MOIRAGHI, Paolo Maria
Via delle Betulle 3
I-27020 Marcignago / IT
02 / CORTESE, Mauro
Via Leonardo Da Vinci
61
I-20812 Limbiate / IT
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/30]
Application number, filing date14811992.817.09.2014
[2017/30]
WO2014IT00247
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016042580
Date:24.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3194184
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60C23/04
[2017/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DRAHTLOSEN ÜBERTRAGUNG VON MESSPARAMETERN[2017/30]
English:TRANSMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS TRANSMISSION OF MEASURED PARAMETERS[2017/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION SANS FIL DE PARAMÈTRES MESURÉS[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2017National basic fee paid 
13.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
13.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2011073928  (ELTEK SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * * page 8 *
by applicantEP1787831