Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3058709

EP3058709 - CONTROLLING VOICE COMPOSITION IN A CONFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2016/34]
Inventor(s)01 / KORYCKI, Jacek A.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2016/34]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2016/34]
Application number, filing date14812061.120.11.2014
[2016/34]
WO2014US66486
Priority number, dateUS20131409114226.11.2013         Original published format: US201314091142
[2016/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015080923
Date:04.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3058709
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015
[2016/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/56
[2016/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/34]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG DER SPRACHZUSAMMENSETZUNG IN EINER KONFERENZ[2016/34]
English:CONTROLLING VOICE COMPOSITION IN A CONFERENCE[2016/34]
French:CONTRÔLE DE LA COMPOSITION D'UNE VOIX DANS UNE CONFÉRENCE[2016/34]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2016National basic fee paid 
17.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/34]
23.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009220065  (AHUJA SUDHIR RAMAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-5 * [I] 8,9;
 [A]US2004091086  (ORTEL WILLIAM CHARLES GORMLEY [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2009094029  (KOCH ROBERT [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004]; figures 1-7 *
by applicant   - HERSHEY, "Super-human multi-talker speech recognition: A graphical modeling approach", COMPUTER SPEECH AND LANGUAGE, (2010), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/j.csl.2008.11.001, pages 45 - 66, XP026545648

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.csl.2008.11.001