Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3080814

EP3080814 - SYSTEM AND METHOD TO PERFORM LOW POWER MEMORY OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/42]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEN, Jian
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / CHUA-EOAN, Lew Go
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/42]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/42]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14812111.426.11.2014
[2016/42]
WO2014US67756
Priority number, dateUS20131410673014.12.2013         Original published format: US201314106730
[2016/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015088790
Date:18.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3080814
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/16
[2016/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/42]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON SPEICHEROPERATIONEN MIT GERINGER LEISTUNG[2016/42]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD TO PERFORM LOW POWER MEMORY OPERATIONS[2016/42]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION D'OPÉRATIONS DE MÉMOIRE DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE[2016/42]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2016National basic fee paid 
10.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/42]
14.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2002159286  (SUNAGA TOSHIO [JP] ET AL) [X] 29 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * [I] 1-28,30;
 [XI]US6052302  (MOYER WILLIAM C [US] ET AL) [X] 29 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 31 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 24 * * column 10, line 6 - line 10; figures 2, 3 * [I] 1-28,30;
 [A]US2009073756  (YANG HSU KAI [US]) [A] 1,9,18,19,29 * figure 1 *