Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3079635

EP3079635 - PATIENT-SPECIFIC GLENOID IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.10.2018  [2018/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2016/42]
Inventor(s)01 / VANASSE, Thomas M.
1735 West North Shore
South Bend, Indiana 46617 / US
02 / KEHRES, Clinton E.
501 Barrington Place
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
03 / TAYLOR, Robert
14109 Fox Chase Drive
Granger, Indiana 46530 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/42]01 / VANASSE, Thomas M.
1735 West North Shore
South Bend, Indiana 46617 / US
02 / KEHRES, Clinton E.
501 Barrington Place
Pierceton, Indiana 46562 / US
03 / TAYLOR, Robert
14109 Fox Chase Drive
Granger, Indiana 46530 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/42]
Application number, filing date14812855.602.12.2014
[2016/42]
WO2014US68131
Priority number, dateUS20131409556503.12.2013         Original published format: US201314095565
[2016/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015084831
Date:11.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3079635
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/40, A61F2/30
[2016/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/42]
TitleGerman:PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHES GLENOIDIMPLANTAT[2016/42]
English:PATIENT-SPECIFIC GLENOID IMPLANT[2016/42]
French:IMPLANT GLÉNOÏDIEN SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN PATIENT[2016/42]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2016National basic fee paid 
29.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/42]
08.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2012141790  (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] * [Y] 9;
 [X]US8532806  (MASSON MARCOS V [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,8 * * column 8, line 11 - line 14 *;
 [Y]US2013261753  (LAPPIN KYLE E [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 1,3 *
by applicantUS2013110470
 US2013110116