Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3010699

EP3010699 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING STRUCTURAL BODY AND MANUFACTURING APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2019/49]
Former [2016/17]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANIUCHI, Hiroshi
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / NAKAJIMA, Kazuhiro
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2019/49]
Former [2016/17]01 / TANIUCHI, Hiroshi
C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / NAKAJIMA, Kazuhiro
C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian
Canon Europe Limited
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[2019/49]
Former [2016/17]Williamson, Brian
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date14812965.316.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014JP03195
Priority number, dateJP2013012787718.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013127877
[2016/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014203517
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3010699
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3010699
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C64/112, B29C64/20, B29C64/40
[2019/30]
Former International [2016/17]B29C67/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BAUTEILES UND HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2016/17]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING STRUCTURAL BODY AND MANUFACTURING APPARATUS THEREFOR[2016/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS STRUCTURAL ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ[2016/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2016National basic fee paid 
18.01.2016Search fee paid 
18.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/17]
26.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2019Fee for grant paid
24.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2014092205  (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [XP]WO2013190817  (CANON KK [JP]) [XP] 1-3,7-9 * claim - * * figure - *;
 [A]WO2004016406  (MOLECULAR IMPRINTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,17,18,19 *;
 [A]US6136132  (KINZIE NORMAN F [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 13 * * claim - *
International search[A]JP2012096430  (KEYENCE CO LTD);
 [A]JPH08281808  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2003159754  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD)