Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3012044

EP3012044 - CONTINUOUS CASTING METHOD FOR CASTING FOR EXTRA THICK STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2016/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMANAKA, Akihiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / TAGUCHI, Kenji
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / TAJIMA, Naoki
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/19]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2016/17]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date14813339.017.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014JP66050
Priority number, dateJP2013012720818.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013127208
[2016/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014203902
Date:24.12.2014
Language:JA
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3012044
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3012044
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/20, B22D11/00, B22D11/128
[2016/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRANGGIESSANLAGE ZUM GIESSEN EINES EXTREM DICKEN STAHLBLECHS[2016/17]
English:CONTINUOUS CASTING METHOD FOR CASTING FOR EXTRA THICK STEEL SHEET[2016/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COULÉE CONTINUE POUR PIÈCE COULÉE POUR TÔLE D'ACIER EXTRA-ÉPAISSE[2016/17]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2015Translation filed 
11.11.2015National basic fee paid 
11.11.2015Search fee paid 
11.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/17]
25.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2018Fee for grant paid
28.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE17.06.2018
LU17.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/26]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE17.06.2018
LU17.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/21]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE17.06.2018
LU17.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/19]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE17.06.2018
LU17.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/17]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
LU17.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/15]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NO09.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2009066929  (POSCO [KR]; YIM CHANG HEE [KR]; WON YOUNG MOK [KR]; PARK JOONG KIL [KR) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [[Technical Solution]]; claim 5 *;
 [AD]JP2007196265  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [AD] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0071] - [0072] *;
 [A]JPH0437456  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0433757  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]  - BOBADILLA M ET AL, "Continuous casting of steel: a close connection between solidification studies and industrial process development", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING: A, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 173, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0921-5093(93)90229-8, ISSN 0921-5093, (19931220), pages 275 - 285, (19931220), XP024167821 [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [1.Intro] , [4.Conclusions] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-5093(93)90229-8
 [A]  - ANTOINE P ET AL, "PREVENTION OF SEGREGATION IN CONTINUOUS CASTING OF STEEL: NEW PROCESS AND INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT AT UNIMETAL NEUVES-MAISONS WORKS", REVUE DE METALLURGIE - CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES, REVUE DE METALLURGIE. PARIS, FR, (19920101), vol. 89, no. 1, ISSN 0035-1563, pages 65 - 72, XP009005763 [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [Intro] , [Conclusions] *
International search[A]JP2005305516  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JP2007296542  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JP2007196265  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JP2012223809  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.)
by applicantJP2007196265
 JP2009255173
 JP2010227941