Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3012044 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3012044



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 166
15.03.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.05.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.04.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.03.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
28.03.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
24.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
04.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.06.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.06.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
25.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.05.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
25.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
25.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.03.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 2
17.02.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
11.01.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
31.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.01.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
22.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
05.01.2016 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
11.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.11.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Description Search / examination 18
11.11.2015 Drawings Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.11.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.10.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
24.12.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
24.12.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
24.12.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 16