Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3012044


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
15.03.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
06.04.2018 (Expected) grant published on  09.05.2018  [2018/19]
03.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.03.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.06.2017 Change - representative
30.05.2017 Amendment by applicant
18.02.2017 Supplementary search report published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
17.02.2017 Change - classification published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
17.02.2017 Change - classification published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
19.08.2016 Change - extension states published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
02.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
25.03.2016 Request for examination filed published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
18.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
24.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.11.2015 Change - representative
12.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
26.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication