Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3012044 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480021821 EP14813339



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9399253Global Dossier 26.07.2016B2
US2016089714 31.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101764517BGlobal Dossier 02.08.2017B1
KR20150104197 14.09.2015A
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPWO2014203902Global Dossier 23.02.2017A1
JP5835531B 24.12.2015B2
Priority number Date
JP2015522940 17.06.2014
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105121062BGlobal Dossier 08.03.2017B
CN105121062 02.12.2015A
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3012044Global Dossier 09.05.2018B1
EP3012044 22.03.2017A4
EP3012044 27.04.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2682518T 20.09.2018T3
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3012044T 28.09.2018T3
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013
EP14813339 17.06.2014
WO2014JP66050 17.06.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014203902Global Dossier 24.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2013127208 18.06.2013