Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2992530

EP2992530 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INCORPORATING DIGITAL FOOTAGE INTO A DIGITAL CINEMATOGRAPHIC TEMPLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.02.2016
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waterston Entertainment (Pty) Ltd.
458 Jacqueline Drive
Garsfontein, Pretoria 0081 / ZA
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / WATERSTON, Grant
458 Jacqueline Drive
Garsfontein Pretoria 0081 / ZA
02 / MYNHARDT, Johann
458 Jacqueline Drive
Garsfontein Pretoria 0081 / ZA
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Barnfather, Karl Jon
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2016/10]
Application number, filing date14814336.529.04.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014ZA00023
Priority number, dateZA2013000319102.05.2013         Original published format: ZA 201303191
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014205460
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2992530
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/034, H04N21/434, H04N21/44, H04N21/8549, H04N5/272
[2016/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINFÜGEN DIGITALER INHALTE IN EINE DIGITALE KINEMATOGRAFISCHE SCHABLONE[2016/10]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INCORPORATING DIGITAL FOOTAGE INTO A DIGITAL CINEMATOGRAPHIC TEMPLATE[2016/10]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INCORPORER UNE SÉQUENCE NUMÉRIQUE DANS UN MODÈLE CINÉMATOGRAPHIQUE NUMÉRIQUE[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2015National basic fee paid 
02.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
15.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201603   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2010002921  (YOOSTAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP IN [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15-18 * the whole document * [A] 14;
 [XI]US2010220197  (DUKELLIS JOHN NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13,15-18 * the whole document * [I] 4,14;
 [I]WO2009079560  (GAUSEREIDE STEIN [US]) [I] 1-13,15-18 * the whole document *;
 [XI]WO2010033233  (SCREEN TEST STUDIOS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-13,15-18 * the whole document * [I] 7