Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3011260

EP3011260 - EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION MANUFACTURING AND DELIVERY PLATFORM, AND BLASTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Change - prioritypublished on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orica International Pte Ltd
78 Shenton Way
06-15 Tower 2
Singapore 079120 / SG
[2016/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ZANK, Johann
14 Pandorea Way
Valentine, New South Wales 2280 / AU
02 / RAYSON, Mark Stuart
374 Tuggerawong Road
Tuggerawong, New South Wales 2259 / AU
03 / SUJANSKY, Vladimir
11 Pippin Avenue
East Burwood, Victoria 3151 / AU
04 / WALTER, James
346 Marmion Street
Cottesloe, Western Australia 6011 / AU
05 / KIRBY, Ian John
91 Monument Road
Ayr KA7 2UF / GB
06 / COOPER, John
11 Lamford Drive
Ayr KA7 4DE / GB
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Brunner, John Michael Owen
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/17]
Application number, filing date14814649.120.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014AU50086
Priority number, dateSG2013004836820.06.2013         Original published format: SG 2013048368
[2020/13]
Former [2016/17]SG2013000483620.06.2013
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014201524
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3011260
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3011260
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU24.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:F42D1/08, C06B21/00, C06B23/00
[2017/09]
Former International [2016/17]F42D1/08, C06B21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG EINER SPRENGSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FREISETZUNGSPLATTFORM SOWIE EXPLOSIONSVERFAHREN[2016/17]
English:EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION MANUFACTURING AND DELIVERY PLATFORM, AND BLASTING METHOD[2016/17]
French:PLATEFORME DE FABRICATION ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE COMPOSITION EXPLOSIVE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DYNAMITAGE[2016/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2016National basic fee paid 
18.01.2016Search fee paid 
18.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
18.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/17]
22.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2019Fee for grant paid
15.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.02.2020Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]NL6918158  (INTERMOUNTAIN RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY INC.) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-3 *;
 [YA]EP1571136  (WESTSPRENG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,5-8,15 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 1,2,4,9-14,16,17;
 [IY]WO9724298  (ICI AUSTRALIA OPERATIONS [AU], et al) [I] 1,2,4,9-14,16,17 * page 7, line 22 - line 27; claim 1 * [Y] 3,5-8,13-15;
 [YA]US3774496  (ROACH R) [Y] 13-15 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 13 * [A] 1-12,16,17
International search[X]US5099763  (COURSEN DAVID L [US], et al);
 [X]US6397719  (VESTRE JAN HANS [NO]);
 [X]GB2338429  (EXCHEM PLC [GB]);
 [X]WO9724298  (ICI AUSTRALIA OPERATIONS [AU], et al);
 [Y]US3774496  (ROACH R);
 [Y]WO2009092137  (ORICA EXPLOSIVES TECH PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [XP]WO2013086572  (ORICA INT PTE LTD [SG], et al)
by applicantNL6918158
 EP1571136
 WO9724298
 US3774496
 WO2009092137
 WO2012AU01527
 WO2012AU01528