EP3077397 - 2-AMINO-6-FLUORO-N-[5-FLUORO-PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-3-CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUND USEFUL AS ATR KINASE INHIBITOR, ITS PREPARATION, DIFFERENT SOLID FORMS AND RADIOLABELLED DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue 15th Floor Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue 15th Floor Boston, MA 02210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARRIER, Jean-Damien 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 02 /
DAVIS, Christopher, John 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 03 /
FRAYSSE, Damien 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 04 /
ETXEBARRIA I JARDI, Gorka 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 05 /
PEGG, Simon 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 06 /
PIERARD, Francoise 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 07 /
PINDER, Joanne 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 08 /
STUDLEY, John 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 09 /
ZWICKER, Carl 1662 Commonwealth Avenue Apt. 45 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 10 /
SANGHVI, Tapan 157 Summer Stgreet 2 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 11 /
WALDO, Michael 4 Patricia Drive Grafton, MA 01519 / US | 12 /
MEDEK, Ales 14 Lockland Road Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 13 /
SHAW, David, Matthew 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 14 /
PANESAR, Maninder 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | 15 /
ZHANG, Yuegang 15 Fairfield Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 16 /
ALEM, Naziha 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/41] | Coles, Andrea Birgit, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14815187.1 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014US68713 | Priority number, date | US201361912636P | 06.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361912636 P | US201462008220P | 05.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462008220 P | US201462058819P | 02.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462058819 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015085132 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077397 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3077397 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07B59/00, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07B59/002 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR,RU,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07B59/00 (RU);
C07C45/00 (US);
C07C45/63 (KR,US);
C07B2200/05 (US);
C07B2200/13 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07D487/04, C07B2200/05 (US,EP);
C07D487/04, C07B2200/13 (EP,US);
C07D487/04, C07B59/002 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2-AMINO-6-FLUOR-N-5-[FLUOR-PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRAZOL[1,5-A] PYRIMIDIN-3-CARBOXAMID-VERBINDUNG ALS ATR-KINASEINHIBITOR, DEREN HERSTELLUNG, UNTERSCHIEDLICHE FESTE FORMEN UND RADIOAKTIV MARKIERTE DERIVATE DAVON | [2016/41] | English: | 2-AMINO-6-FLUORO-N-[5-FLUORO-PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-3-CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUND USEFUL AS ATR KINASE INHIBITOR, ITS PREPARATION, DIFFERENT SOLID FORMS AND RADIOLABELLED DERIVATIVES THEREOF | [2016/41] | French: | COMPOSE 2-AMINO -6-FLUORO-N- [5-FLUORO-PYRIDIN -3-YL]PYRAZOLO [1,5-A]PYRIMIDINE-3-CARBOXAMIDE UTILE COMME INHIBITEUR DE LA KINASE ATR, SA PRÉPARATION, DIFFÉRENTES FORMES SOLIDES ET DÉRIVÉS RADIOMARQUÉS DE CELUI-CI | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 15.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/39] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | BG | 18.12.2019 | |
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | SE | 18.09.2019 | |
BG | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011003065 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-141 * reaction scheme 13, p.44;; claims 1,17 *; | [A]WO2012178124 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 25-141 * claims 1,39,83,86 *; | [XPA]WO2014089379 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [XP] 26-141 * paragraphs [00153] , [ 00221]; example 3f; claims 223-228,285; compounds I-G-32 *[A] 1-25 |