blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3013190

EP3013190 - POT DEVICE AND METHOD RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2021
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.01.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2023Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 26.07.2023  [2023/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plantagon International AB
Rålambsvägen 17 22 Floor
112 59 Stockholm / SE
[2016/18]
Inventor(s)01 / RENTZHOG, Mikael Lennart
Sweco Industry AB
Gjörwellsgatan 22
P O Box 34044
100 26 Stockholm / SE
02 / RYLENIUS, Jan Axel
Sweco Industry AB
Gjörwellsgatan 22
P O Box 34044
100 26 Stockholm / SE
 [2021/07]
Former [2016/18]01 / RENTZHOG, Mikael Lennart
Sweco Industry AB
Gjörwellsgatan 22
P O Box 34044
S-100 26 Stockholm / SE
02 / RYLENIUS, Jan Axel
Sweco Industry AB
Gjörwellsgatan 22
P O Box 34044
S-100 26 Stockholm / SE
Representative(s)Groth & Co. KB
P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[2016/18]
Application number, filing date14817032.726.06.2014
[2016/18]
WO2014SE50794
Priority number, dateSE2013005077526.06.2013         Original published format: SE 1350775
[2016/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014209214
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3013190
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3013190
Date:17.02.2021
Language:EN
[2021/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE31.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2017
ClassificationIPC:A47G7/02, A01G9/08
[2017/08]
CPC:
A01G9/02 (EP,SE,US); A47G7/025 (EP,SE,US); A01G9/028 (US);
A01G9/042 (EP,US); A01G9/088 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2016/18]A47G7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TOPFVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN[2016/18]
English:POT DEVICE AND METHOD RELATED THERETO[2016/18]
French:DISPOSITIF DE POT ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ À CE DERNIER[2016/18]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2016National basic fee paid 
15.01.2016Search fee paid 
15.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
15.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/18]
15.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2020Fee for grant paid
28.09.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.11.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.10.2018Request for further processing filed
04.10.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.10.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201805   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2018
30.06.201906   M06   Fee paid on   26.12.2019
30.06.202007   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2020
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.06.2014
AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CY17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
IT17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
IE26.06.2021
LU26.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
FR30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
[2023/30]
Former [2023/29]HU26.06.2014
AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
IT17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
IE26.06.2021
LU26.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
FR30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/34]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
IT17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
IE26.06.2021
LU26.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
FR30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/23]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
IT17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
IE26.06.2021
LU26.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
FR30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/21]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
IE26.06.2021
LU26.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/18]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
LU26.06.2021
Former [2022/13]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SI17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2022/10]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2022/07]AL17.02.2021
AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/50]AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RO17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/49]AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
DK17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/48]AT17.02.2021
CZ17.02.2021
EE17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/46]AT17.02.2021
FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/42]FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
IS17.06.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/39]FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
PL17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/38]FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
SE17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/37]FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
RS17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/36]FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
BG17.05.2021
GR18.05.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/35]FI17.02.2021
HR17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
PT17.06.2021
Former [2021/33]FI17.02.2021
LT17.02.2021
PT17.06.2021
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US1056669  (HARRIS SAMUEL E [US]);
 [A]US1830769  (EDGAR ROTHERMEL JAMES);
 [A]US2002130242  (THURNER MARTIN [DE]);
 [A]CN102972228  (NANTONG DANDELION IND DESIGN SERVICE CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.