Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3017344

EP3017344 - GENERATING AND OPTIMIZING PROTOCOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.02.2018  [2018/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Skydrop, LLC
5455 West 11000 North
Suite 201
Highland, UT 84003 / US
[2016/19]
Inventor(s)01 / ENDRIZZI, Clark
2064 Village Point Way
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
02 / ROMNEY, Matt
262 Twin River Loop
Alpine, UT 84004 / US
03 / DALLEY, Mack
80 West 120 South
Alpine, UT 84004 / US
04 / MARS, Robert
2706 Silver Place
Superior, CO 80027 / US
 [2016/19]
Representative(s)Walker, Ross Thomson
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/19]Walker, Ross Thomson
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date14819684.325.06.2014
[2016/19]
WO2014US44190
Priority number, dateUS201361841828P01.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361841828 P
US201461924154P06.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461924154 P
[2016/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015002790
Date:08.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3017344
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01G25/16
[2017/08]
Former International [2016/19]G05D7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG UND OPTIMIERUNG VON PROTOKOLLEN[2016/19]
English:GENERATING AND OPTIMIZING PROTOCOLS[2016/19]
French:GÉNÉRATION ET OPTIMISATION DE PROTOCOLES[2016/19]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2016National basic fee paid 
29.01.2016Search fee paid 
29.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
26.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/08]
27.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010010682  (CARDINAL BRUCE J [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0024] , [0026] , [2231]; figures 1,3,4 * [I] 2-5,7-10;
 [A]US2003093159  (SIEMINSKI JAMES [US]) [A] 1,6,12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2006116791  (RAVULA SHARMILA [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006293797  (WEILER STEVEN W [US]);
 [Y]US2012303168  (HALAHAN PATRICK B [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011238847  (SCOTT SHERRYL LEE LORRAINE [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2012322384  (ZERR DERIN M [US], et al)