Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3031465

EP3031465 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PROMOTING BONE TISSUE FORMATION, CONTAINING STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA LEAF EXTRACT AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jeonnam Bioindustry Foundation
30-5, Dongsunonggongdanji-gil, Naju-si
Jeollanam-do 520-330 / KR
For all designated states
Yungjin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
1057, Cheonho-daero
Gangdong-gu
Seoul 134-721 / KR
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Chul Yung
105-203,10 Pungamsunhwan-ro
Seo-gu
Gwangju 62056 / KR
02 / PAN, Sang O
23, Pyeonggyo-ro
29beon-gil
Buk-gu
Gwangju 61172 / KR
03 / SEOL, Hee Jin
1-208, 73 Seoksil-ro 260beon-gil
Wolmun-ri, Wabu-eup
Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12203 / KR
04 / LEE, Gyu Ok
101-404, 136 Udeuraendeu-gil
Usan-ri, Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59337 / KR
05 / JANG, Wook Jin
3492 Jangheung-daero
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59327 / KR
06 / KIM, Hee Sook
337-8 Guman-ro
Gaecheon-myeon
Goseong-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52904 / KR
07 / KIM, Jae Yong
304-207, 60 Wanggung-gil
Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 57970 / KR
08 / KANG, Hu Won
205-7, Yeongsanpo-ro
Naju-si Jeollanam-do 58266 / KR
09 / LEE, Dong Wook
203, 39 Bukbu-ro
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59320 / KR
10 / KIM, Sun Oh
201-1003, 52, Yangil-ro
Buk-gu
Gwangju 61091 / KR
11 / KIM, Jae Gap
2-507, 51, Gyeongin-ro
134beon-gil
Sosa-gu
Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14735 / KR
12 / PARK, Joon Yung
68 Eojinnuri-gil
Muan-gun Jeollanam-do 58564 / KR
 [2017/34]
Former [2017/32]01 / CHOI, Chul Yung
105-203,10 Pungamsunhwan-ro
Seo-gu
Gwangju 62056 / KR
02 / PAN, Sang O
23, Pyeonggyo-ro
29beon-gil
Buk-gu
Gwangju 61172 / KR
03 / SEOL, Hee Jin
1-208, 73 Seoksil-ro 260beon-gil
Wolmun-ri, Wabu-eup
Namyangiu-si Gyeonggi-do 12203 / KR
04 / LEE, Gyu Ok
101-404, 136 Udeuraendeu-gil
Usan-ri, Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59337 / KR
05 / JANG, Wook Jin
3492 Jangheung-daero
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59327 / KR
06 / KIM, Hee Sook
337-8 Guman-ro
Gaecheon-myeon
Goseong-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52904 / KR
07 / KIM, Jae Yong
304-207, 60 Wanggung-gil
Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 57970 / KR
08 / KANG, Hu Won
205-7, Yeongsanpo-ro
Naju-si Jeollanam-do 58266 / KR
09 / LEE, Dong Wook
203, 39 Bukbu-ro
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59320 / KR
10 / KIM, Sun Oh
201-1003, 52, Yangil-ro
Buk-gu
Gwangju 61091 / KR
11 / KIM, Jae Gap
2-507, 51, Gyeongin-ro
134beon-gil
Sosa-gu
Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14735 / KR
12 / PARK, Joon Yung
68 Eojinnuri-gil
Muan-gun Jeollanam-do 58564 / KR
Former [2016/24]01 / CHOI, Chul Yung
105-203,10 Pungamsunhwan-ro
Seo-gu
Gwangju 62056 / KR
02 / PAN, Sang O
23, Pyeonggyo-ro
29beon-gil
Buk-gu
Gwangju 61172 / KR
03 / SEOL, Hee Jin
96-14, Bongseon 2-ro
Nam-gu
Gwangju 61686 / KR
04 / LEE, Gyu Ok
136, Udeuraendeu-gil
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59337 / KR
05 / JANG, Wook Jin
3492 Jangheung-daero
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59327 / KR
06 / KIM, Hee Sook
337-8 Guman-ro
Gaecheon-myeon
Goseong-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52904 / KR
07 / KIM, Jae Yong
60 Wanggung-gil
Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 57970 / KR
08 / KANG, Hu Won
205-7, Yeongsanpo-ro
Naju-si Jeollanam-do 58266 / KR
09 / LEE, Dong Wook
203, 39 Bukbu-ro
Jangheung-eup
Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59320 / KR
10 / KIM, Sun Oh
201-1003, 52, Yangil-ro
Buk-gu
Gwangju 61091 / KR
11 / KIM, Jae Gap
2-507, 51, Gyeongin-ro
134beon-gil
Sosa-gu
Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14735 / KR
12 / PARK, Joon Yung
68 Eojinnuri-gil
Muan-gun Jeollanam-do 58564 / KR
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[2019/46]
Former [2016/24]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date14819974.829.04.2014
[2016/24]
WO2014KR03742
Priority number, dateKR2013007619030.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130076190
[2016/24]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015002378
Date:08.01.2015
Language:KO
[2015/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3031465
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3031465
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.01.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/71, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61P19/00
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER BILDUNG VON KNOCHENGEWEBE MIT BLATTEXTRAKT AUS STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA ALS WIRKSTOFF[2016/24]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PROMOTING BONE TISSUE FORMATION, CONTAINING STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA LEAF EXTRACT AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT[2016/24]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR FAVORISER LA FORMATION DE TISSU OSSEUX, CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT DE FEUILLE DE STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF[2016/24]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2015Translation filed 
03.11.2015National basic fee paid 
03.11.2015Search fee paid 
03.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/24]
24.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2019Fee for grant paid
03.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XD]KR101221617B  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XD] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0058] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] *;
 [XD]KR101243115B  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XD] 1-7 * paragraph [0032]; claims 1-2 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [XD]KR20130020095  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XD] 1-8 * claims 1-7 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0058] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [XP]KR101317668B  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0041] , [0065]; claims 1-3 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figures 8-9 * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0138] *
International search[A]KR101221617B  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]);
 [A]KR101243115B  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]);
 [A]KR20130020095  (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]);
 [A]  - HUAI-BIN WANG ET AL., "TRITERPENOID GLYCOSIDES FROM STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (19931101), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 1389 - 1394, XP026631130

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(91)80035-Y
 [A]  - HUAI-BIN WANG, "BISEPOXYLIGNAN GLYCOSIDES FROM STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (19931201), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1621 - 1624, XP026631691

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)90857-4
by applicantKR20130020095
 KR101167589B
 KR101243115B
 KR101221617B