Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3018817

EP3018817 - ELECTRICITY-GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd.
11-2, Tsurumaki 2-chome
Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
[2016/19]
Inventor(s)01 / FURUKAWA, Kenichi
c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
11-2 Tsurumaki 2-chome
Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
02 / NUMAKUNAI, Takayuki
c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
11-2 Tsurumaki 2-chome
Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
 [2016/19]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/19]Solf, Annkathrin
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date14820502.426.06.2014
[2016/19]
WO2014JP67046
Priority number, dateJP2013014191705.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013141917
[2016/19]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015002069
Date:08.01.2015
Language:JA
[2015/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3018817
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02N2/00
[2016/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
TitleGerman:STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/19]
English:ELECTRICITY-GENERATING DEVICE[2016/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ[2016/19]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2016Translation filed 
14.01.2016National basic fee paid 
14.01.2016Search fee paid 
14.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
03.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/23]
02.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2008072862  (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD);
 [Y]WO2011158473  (UNIV KANAZAWA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]WO2013038682  (UNIV KANAZAWA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al);
 [XE]WO2014119202  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]);
 [A]WO2012157246  (UNIV KANAZAWA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH0990065  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [A]US8093869  (GUNDERSON GRAHAM A [US])
by applicantWO2011158473