blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3018817 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3018817



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 169
17.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
02.02.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.04.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.02.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.01.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
14.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
14.01.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
14.01.2016 Description Search / examination 34
14.01.2016 Drawings Search / examination 9
14.01.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.01.2016 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
13.11.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
08.01.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 38