blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3018817


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
01.02.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.09.2016 Change - extension states published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
04.08.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.05.2016 Change - representative
08.04.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.05.2016  [2016/19]
08.04.2016 Request for examination filed published on  11.05.2016  [2016/19]
17.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
30.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
16.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
15.01.2016 Change - representative
15.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
22.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication