Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3087172

EP3087172 - PALYTOXYN, ITS MEDICAL USE AND PROCESS FOR ITS ISOLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coral Biome
Marseille 9 - Zone Luminy Entreprises Case 922
163 avenue de Luminy
13009 Marseille / FR
For all designated states
Institut de Recherche pour le Développement (IRD)
Le sextant 44, Bd de Dunkerque
CS 90 009
13572 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/44]For all designated states
Coral Biome
Marseille 9 - Zone Luminy Entreprises Case 922
163 avenue de Luminy
13009 Marseille / FR
For all designated states
Institut de Recherche pour le Développement ( IRD)
Le sextant 44, Bd de Dunkerque
CS 90 009
13572 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DETOURNAY, Olivier
4, chemin de Mordeau
F-13190 Allauch / FR
02 / LORQUIN, Jean
1195, chemin de la Fontaine de cinq sous
F-83330 le Beausset / FR
03 / GAULT, Frederic
Chemin de la Pierre Mouraou
Allée du Ganeou / FR
 [2016/44]
Representative(s)Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/44]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date14821509.817.12.2014
[2016/44]
WO2014EP03411
Priority number, dateEP2013019785417.12.2013         Original published format: EP 13197854
[2016/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015090591
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3087172
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/12
[2016/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
TitleGerman:PALYTOXYN, DESSEN MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ISOLIERUNG[2016/44]
English:PALYTOXYN, ITS MEDICAL USE AND PROCESS FOR ITS ISOLATION[2016/44]
French:PALYTOXINE, SON USAGE MÉDICAL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SON ISOLATION[2016/44]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2016National basic fee paid 
18.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
29.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]  - JAMES D REIMER ET AL, "Molecular identification of symbiotic dinoflagellates (Symbiodinium spp.) from Palythoa spp. (Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Japan", CORAL REEFS ; JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR REEF STUDIES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060914), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00338-006-0151-4, ISSN 1432-0975, pages 521 - 527, XP019459567 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 521, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00338-006-0151-4
 [XI]  - R. J. QUINN ET AL, "Anticancer activity of zoanthids and the associated toxin, palytoxin, against ehrlich ascites tumor and P-388 lymphocytic leukemia in mice", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (19740201), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jps.2600630217, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 257 - 260, XP055113357 [X] 1,3,4,7-11 * abstract * * page 258; table 1 * * page 259; tables II, III * * page 260; table IV * [I] 2,5,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600630217
 [A]  - JAMES DAVIS REIMER ET AL, "Species Diversity of Shallow Water Zoanthids (Cnidaria: Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Florida", JOURNAL OF MARINE BIOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 10, no. 5114, doi:10.1046/j.1365-294X.2002.01652.x, ISSN 1687-9481, pages 57 - 14, XP055113398 [A] 1-11 * page 3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2012/856079
 [A]  - HIDESHI NAKAMURA ET AL, "Studies on Polyketide Metabolites of a Symbiotic Dinoflagellate, Symbiodinium sp", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19980101), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0009-2673, page 781, XP055113408 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 782; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.71.781
 [AD]  - BERESS L ET AL, "A method for the isolation of the caribbean palytoxin (C-PTX) from the coelenterate (zooanthid) Palythoa caribaeorum", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(83)90013-2, ISSN 0041-0101, (19830101), pages 285 - 290, (19830101), XP025508816 [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 285 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(83)90013-2
 [A]  - NAKAMURA H ET AL, "Isolation of zooxanthellatoxins, novel vasoconstrictive substances from the zooxanthella Symbiodinium sp", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 31, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(93)90172-F, ISSN 0041-0101, (19930401), pages 371 - 376, (19930401), XP025828057 [A] 1-11 * page 371 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(93)90172-F
 [AD]  - JONATHAN R. DEEDS ET AL, "Palytoxin Found in Palythoa sp. Zoanthids (Anthozoa, Hexacorallia) Sold in the Home Aquarium Trade", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0018235, ISSN 1932-6203, page e18235, XP055113680 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0018235