blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3087172


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Change - inventor
17.07.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.05.2019 Change - representative
10.04.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.05.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.01.2018 First examination report
12.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.02.2017 Change - extension states published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
13.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.09.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
30.09.2016 Request for examination filed published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
16.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
17.08.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
15.07.2016 Change - representative
15.07.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
15.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
26.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication