Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3082849

EP3082849 - USES OF COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING CAT ALLERGENS IN THE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/43]COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING CAT ALLERGENS IN THE ENVIRONMENT
[2019/33]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2016/43]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / WELLS, George
4204 Olive Street
St. Louis, Missouri 63108 / US
02 / TISSOT-FAVRE, Delphine
Place de l'Orme 1
1124 Gollion / CH
03 / SATYARAJ, Ebenezer
16300 Centerpointe Drive
Wildwood, Missouri 63040 / US
04 / ECK, Juergen
Burgstrasse 3
64625 Bensheim / DE
05 / MEYER, Daniel
Tannbergstrasse 16
6214 Schenkon / CH
06 / ERTONGUR-FAUTH, Torsten
Donnersbergring 24
64295 Darmstadt / DE
07 / PELZER, Alexander
Hartenauer Strasse 49
64404 Bickenbach / DE
08 / SHERRILL, Scott
611 Packford Drive
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
09 / SUN, Peichuan
5 Crosswinds Drive
St. Louis, Missouri 63132 / US
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/45]
Former [2016/43]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date14821856.315.12.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014IB66936
Priority number, dateUS201361918420P19.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361918420 P
[2016/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015092663
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3082849
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3082849
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A23K20/189, A23K50/40, C11D3/386, C11D11/00, A61K38/48, A61K39/35, A61K38/54
[2019/33]
Former International [2016/43]A61K38/48, A61K38/54, A61K39/35
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNGEN VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON KATZENALLERGENEN IN DER UMGEBUNG[2019/33]
English:USES OF COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING CAT ALLERGENS IN THE ENVIRONMENT[2019/33]
French:UTILISATIONS DE COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR RÉDUIRE LES ALLERGÈNES FÉLINS DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT[2019/33]
Former [2016/43]ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON KATZENALLERGENEN IN DER UMGEBUNG
Former [2016/43]COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING CAT ALLERGENS IN THE ENVIRONMENT
Former [2016/43]COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR RÉDUIRE LES ALLERGÈNES FÉLINS DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT
Entry into regional phase08.06.2016National basic fee paid 
08.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
06.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
29.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2019Fee for grant paid
30.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO2004007658  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [XD] 1-3,5-7,9,10,13,16-18,21-26 * the whole document * [I] 4,8,11,12,14,20;
 [XDI]WO2009009061  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [XD] 1,16,22-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] , [0055]; claim 20 * [I] 9,13,19,20,27-32;
 [XD]US2006142394  (KAPITZ CARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [XD] 1-6,9-11,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * claims 18,19, 40-47 *;
 [X]US2007196353  (PAYTON HUGH W [US]) [X] 1-4,9-16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] - [0020] , [0034] , [0040] - [0042] - [0045] , [0096]; claims 1-5; table 2 *;
 [X]US2008124297  (PAYTON HUGH W [US]) [X] 1-4,9-14,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007113633  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract *;
 [A]  - KROLL KRISTENSEN A ET AL, "DETERMINATION OF ISOFORMS, N-LINKED GLYCAN STRUCTURE AND DISULFIDE BOND LINKAGES OF THE MAJOR CAT ALLERGEN FEL D1 BY A MASS SPECTROMETRIC APPROACH", BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, WALTER DE GRUYTER GMBH & CO, BERLIN, DE, (19970801), vol. 378, no. 8, ISSN 1431-6730, pages 899 - 908, XP009038172 [A] 1-32 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5679630
 EP0425018
 WO2010030058
    - YUANXIU WANG ET AL, "Preparation of High F-Value Oligopeptides from Corn Gluten Meal and Its Anti-fatigue Functions", BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING AND BIOTECHNOLOGY (ICBEB), 2012 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120528), doi:10.1109/ICBEB.2012.307, ISBN 978-1-4577-1987-5, pages 429 - 432, XP032207721

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/iCBEB.2012.307
    - Szymkiewicz Agata ET AL, "Examination of immunogenic properties of hydrolysed milk and pea proteins - application of immunoblotting technique.", POLISH JOURNAL OF FOOD AND NUTRITION SCIENCES, PL, (20030101), vol. 12, no. Suppl.1., ISSN 1230-0322, pages 79 - 83, XP055290620
    - Barbara Wroblewska ET AL, "Immunoreactive properties of peptide fractions of cow whey milk proteins after enzymatic hydrolysis", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., GB, (20041001), vol. 39, no. 8, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2004.00857.x, ISSN 0950-5423, pages 839 - 850, XP055564159

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2004.00857.x
by applicantUS7704532
 US5826546
 US2011135750
 US2004007251
 US2006142394
 US8454953
    - VAN REE ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 104, pages 1223 - 1230
    - KLEINE-TEBBE ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 100, pages 256 - 262
    - VALENTA; KRAFT, IMMUNOL REV., (2001), vol. 179, pages 119 - 127
    - AALBERSE, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 106, pages 228 - 238
    - KAISER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 37730 - 37735
    - KRISTENSEN ET AL., BIOL. CHCM., (1997), vol. 378, pages 899 - 908
    - BARTHOLOME ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 76, pages 503 - 06
    - CHARPIN ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 88, pages 77 - 82
    - DABROWSKI ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 86, pages 462 - 465
    - ANDERSON ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL, (1985), vol. 76, pages 563 - 569
    - VAN MILLIGEN ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY APPL. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 92, pages 375 - 378
    - GEANY ET AL., PEDIATRICS, (200508), vol. 116, no. 2
    - GERGE; DREBORG, PED. ALLERGY IMMUN., (1998), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 25 - 30
    - SCARLETT ET AL., J. APPL. ANIMAL WELFARE SCI., (1999), vol. 2, pages 41 - 57
    - ALLERPET, ALLERPET, INC.
    - MCKNIGHT-HANES; WHITFORD, CARIES RES., (1992), vol. 26, pages 345 - 350