Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3020761

EP3020761 - ANTIVIRAL VINYL CHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION, ANTIVIRAL VINYL CHLORIDE RESIN SHEET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, INTERIOR SHEET, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INTERIOR SHEET, POLYVINYL CHLORIDE RESIN INTERIOR SHEET, ANTIVIRAL WALLPAPER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ANTIVIRAL WALLPAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lonseal Corporation
4-15-3 Midori
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8570 / JP
[2016/20]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Taro
c/o LONSEAL CORPORATION
TSUCHIURA FACTORY
5-3 Higashi
Nakanuki-cho
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0006 / JP
02 / ONO, Tomohiro
c/o LONSEAL CORPORATION
TSUCHIURA FACTORY
5-3 Higashi
Nakanuki-cho
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0006 / JP
03 / TERUI, Tomoko
c/o LONSEAL CORPORATION
TSUCHIURA FACTORY
5-3 Higashi
Nakanuki-cho
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0006 / JP
04 / MATSUMOTO, Hiroki
c/o LONSEAL CORPORATION
TSUCHIURA FACTORY
5-3 Higashi
Nakanuki-cho
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0006 / JP
05 / TOMIZAWA, Hideyuki
c/o LONSEAL CORPORATION
TSUCHIURA FACTORY
5-3 Higashi
Nakanuki-cho
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0006 / JP
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/20]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon Feray Lenne Conseil
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date14822191.411.07.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014JP68588
Priority number, dateJP2013014710012.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013147100
JP2013014710112.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013147101
JP2013014710212.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013147102
JP2013021717118.10.2013         Original published format: JP 2013217171
JP2013021742118.10.2013         Original published format: JP 2013217421
[2016/20]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015005476
Date:15.01.2015
Language:JA
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3020761
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.01.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L27/06, C08K5/42, A01N25/34, A01N41/04, A01P1/00, B32B27/18, B32B27/30, E04F13/07
[2017/10]
Former International [2016/20]C08L27/06, A01N25/34, A01N41/04, A01P1/00, B32B27/18, B32B27/30, C08K5/42, E04F13/07
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
TitleGerman:ANTIVIRALE VINYLCHLORIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ANTIVIRALE VINYLCHLORIDHARZFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON, INNENFOLIE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER INNENFOLIE, POLYVINYLCHLORIDHARZ-INNENFOLIE, ANTIVIRALE TAPETE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ANTIVIRALEN TAPETE[2016/20]
English:ANTIVIRAL VINYL CHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION, ANTIVIRAL VINYL CHLORIDE RESIN SHEET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, INTERIOR SHEET, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INTERIOR SHEET, POLYVINYL CHLORIDE RESIN INTERIOR SHEET, ANTIVIRAL WALLPAPER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ANTIVIRAL WALLPAPER[2016/20]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE ANTIVIRALE, FEUILLE DE RÉSINE DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE ANTIVIRALE, ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE LES FABRIQUER, FEUILLE INTÉRIEURE, PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER LA FEUILLE INTÉRIEURE, FEUILLE INTÉRIEURE À BASE DE RÉSINE DE POLYCHLORURE DE VINYLE, PAPIER PEINT ANTIVIRAL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER LE PAPIER PEINT ANTIVIRAL[2016/20]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2016Translation filed 
03.02.2016National basic fee paid 
03.02.2016Search fee paid 
03.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
10.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]CN101050293  (SHENYANG CHEMICAL CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3 * example -; claim - *
International search[X]WO9846654  (SHIN DAI-ICHI VINYL CORP.);
 [Y]JPH09143326  (SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPH09235460  (SANYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JPH04337345  (ACHILLES CORP.);
 [A]JP2011088965  (LONSEAL CORP.);
 [AP]JP2014114380  (TAIYO VINYL CORP.)
by applicantJP2009127163
 JP4584339B
 JP2011152102