Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3021493

EP3021493 - RECEIVING CIRCUIT AND TRANSMITTING CIRCUIT; COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation
4-14-1 Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa / JP
[2016/36]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWASAKI Kenichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2016/20]
Application number, filing date14823158.205.06.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014JP64939
Priority number, dateJP2013014333009.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013143330
[2016/20]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015005032
Date:15.01.2015
Language:JA
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3021493
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3021493
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.01.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B3/52, H04B1/59, G06K7/00, G06K7/10
[2017/08]
Former International [2016/20]H04B3/52, H04B1/59
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EMPFANGSSCHALTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSSCHALTUNG; KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2016/20]
English:RECEIVING CIRCUIT AND TRANSMITTING CIRCUIT; COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION METHOD[2016/20]
French:CIRCUIT DE RÉCEPTION ET CIRCUIT DE TRANSMISSION, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION[2016/20]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2015Translation filed 
22.01.2016National basic fee paid 
22.01.2016Search fee paid 
22.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
01.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2018Fee for grant paid
05.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SI21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
MT05.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
GB21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/26]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SI21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
GB21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/24]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
GB21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
GB21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9217866  (INTEGRATED SILICON DESIGN PTY [AU]) [X] 1-4,7,9-12,14 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 35 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2 * * page 8, line 4 - line 22 * * page 13, line 40 - page 15, line 21 * * figures 1,8 * [Y] 5,6,13,15;
 [YA]US2009008753  (ROFOUGARAN AHMADREZA REZA [US]) [Y] 5,6,13,15 * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0198] * * paragraph [0283] * [A] 1-4,7-12,14
 [XD]  - PURSULA P ET AL, "Millimeter-Wave Identification-A New Short-Range Radio System for Low-Power High Data-Rate Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080923), vol. 56, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TMTT.2008.2004252, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 2221 - 2228, XP011235159 [XD] 1,4-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2008.2004252
International search[X]EP2199947  (LEGIC IDENTSYSTEMS AG);
 [Y]JP2005101892  (SONY CORP.)
by applicant   - P. PURSULA, "Millimeter-Wave Identification-A New Short Radio System for Low-Power High Data-Rate Application", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (200810), vol. 56, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/TMTT.2008.2004252, XP011235159

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2008.2004252
    - P. PURSULA, "60-GHz Millimeter-Wave Identification Reader on 90-nm CMOS and LTCC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (201104), vol. 59, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/TMTT.2011.2114200, XP011372553

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2011.2114200