Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3019677

EP3019677 - MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/20]MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS.
[2016/36]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ceraloc Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2016/29]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
Floor Iptech AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / PERVAN, Darko
Bygatan 30
S-263 61 Viken / SE
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Välinge Innovation AB
Patent Department
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date14823598.908.07.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014SE50877
Priority number, dateSE2013005085609.07.2013         Original published format: SE 1350856
SE2014000029110.06.2014         Original published format: SE 1400291
[2016/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015005860
Date:15.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3019677
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.01.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/08, E04F13/14, B32B9/00, B32B3/06, E04F13/26, E04F13/08, E04F15/02, E04C2/28, E04C2/38, E04F13/24
[2017/13]
Former International [2016/20]E04F15/08, E04F13/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHES VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM FÜR BODENPLATTEN[2016/20]
English:MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS[2016/36]
French:SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE MÉCANIQUE POUR DALLES DE SOL[2016/20]
Former [2016/20]MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS.
Entry into regional phase02.02.2016National basic fee paid 
02.02.2016Search fee paid 
02.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
12.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1441086  (SCHULTE-FUEHRES JOSEF [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] , [0023] , [0026] - [0028] - [0031] * * figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [IA]US2007220822  (PERMESANG CLAUS [DE]) [I] 1-10,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0050] - [0056] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 11,12,14;
 [A]US2013047536  (PERVAN DARKO [SE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0101] * * figure 1a *;
 [A]US8156705  (ALFORD TOM [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 47 - line 58 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 5 * * column 6, line 39 - line 54 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2013042563  (PERVAN DARKO [SE] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1640530  (FLOORING IND LTD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0057] * * figures 3,4 *
International search[A]EP2492416  (SILICALIA S L);
 [A]US2009107076  (KIM SOON-BAE);
 [A]US2004244325  (NELSON THOMAS J);
 [A]US2013042563  (PERVAN DARKO ET AL);
 [A]US2009151290  (LIU DAVID C);
 [A]WO2013041264  (CERAMICA FAETANO S P A ET AL)