Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3079695

EP3079695 - GLUCOSYLCERAMIDE SYNTHASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.09.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
50 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2018/29]
Former [2016/42]For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
500 Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEONARD, John P.
c/o Sanofi
55 Corporate Drive
Mail Code: 55A-505A
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
02 / DELEUZE, Jean-François
c/o Sanofi
54 rue La Boétie
F-75008 Paris / FR
03 / ITIER, Jean-Michel
c/o Sanofi
54 rue La Boétie
F-75008 Paris / FR
04 / ORSINI, Cécile
c/o Sanofi
54 rue La Boétie
F-75008 Paris / FR
05 / RET-LECUELLE, Gwénaëlle
54 rue La Boétie
F-75008 Paris / FR
06 / VIALE, Sandra
c/o Sanofi
54 rue La Boétie
F-75008 Paris / FR
 [2016/42]
Representative(s)Garner, Stephen , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2016/42]
Application number, filing date14824245.609.12.2014
[2016/42]
WO2014US69338
Priority number, dateUS201361914842P11.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361914842 P
[2016/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015089067
Date:18.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3079695
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/439, A61P9/00
[2016/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/42]
TitleGerman:GLUCOSYLCERAMID-SYNTHASE-HEMMER[2016/42]
English:GLUCOSYLCERAMIDE SYNTHASE INHIBITORS[2016/42]
French:INHIBITEURS DE LA GLUCOSYLCÉRAMIDE SYNTHASE[2016/42]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2016National basic fee paid 
06.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/42]
30.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.01.2019Request for further processing filed
02.01.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.01.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.01.2018Request for further processing filed
17.01.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.01.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2012129084  (GENZYME CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-67 * The claimed compounds, including those of claims 19 and 20, as glucosylceramide synthase inhibitors, and their use for treating lysosomal storage diseases, including Fabry disease: see pg 1, 1st par; pg 65; pg.67; fig. 2, 2B; examples and figures. See in particular compound GCS 452 as an effective agent for lowering globotriaosylceramide (GL-3 or Gb3) in the heart of subjects affected by Fabry disease: see pg. 76; pg. 144-145; example 111. in particular, pg 238, l. 6, 8 and figures 2A, 2B, 3. *;
 [IP]WO2014043068  (GENZYME CORP [US]) [IP] 1-67 * See the compounds shown on pages 40-46 in the examples and in the claims (e.g. claim 266), for use as Glucosylceramide synthase inhibitors, and their use for treating lysoyomal storage diseases, such as Fabri disease (see page 44, line 14; claim 258-259; page 131, figure 1) *;
 [YP]WO2014152215  (GENZYME CORP [US]) [YP] 1-67 * The preferred compound GCS452, as glucosylceramide synthase inhibitor, and its use alone in combination with enzyme therapy, for treating lysosomal storage diseases, including Fabry disease: see pg 17 and claims *
 [Y]  - URBANELLI LORENA ET AL, "Therapeutic approaches for lysosomal storage diseases: a patent update.", RECENT PATENTS ON CNS DRUG DISCOVERY AUG 2013, (201308), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 2212-3954, pages 91 - 109, XP002735910 [Y] 1-67 * Treatment of lysosomal storage diseases: the preferred compound GCS452 reduces accumulation of Gb3 glycolipid in subjects affected by Fabry syndrome: see page 13 chapter 6 on small molecule therapy for substrate reduction, and see table 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/15748898113089990002
 [Y]  - GAMBARIN ET AL., "When Should Cardiologists Suspect Anderson-Fabry disease ?", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, (201011), vol. 106, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.AMJCARD.2010.07.016, pages 1492 - 1499, XP002735911 [Y] 1-67 * Fabry disease is characterised by accumulation of globotriaosylceramide (GL-3) in the myocytes: see abstract and figure 3 and page 1496-1497, section "Endomyocardial biopsy" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.AMJCARD.2010.07.016