Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3082735

EP3082735 - SHAPING KERATIN FIBRES USING OXOETHANOIC ACID AND/OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / WASHINGTON, Randy, Purnell
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
02 / REED, Jamie, Angel
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
03 / WILLEY, Alan, David
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
04 / DAVIS, Stephanie, Lee
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/18]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2016/43]Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
PO Box 14
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date14825551.619.12.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014US71436
Priority number, dateUS201361918130P19.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361918130 P
[2016/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015095671
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3082735
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3082735
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/34, A61K8/365, A61K8/40, A61K8/49, A61Q5/04, A61Q5/06
[2016/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FORMUNG VON KERATINFASERN MIT OXOETHANSÄURE UND/ODER DERIVATEN DAVON[2016/43]
English:SHAPING KERATIN FIBRES USING OXOETHANOIC ACID AND/OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF[2016/43]
French:FORMAGE DE FIBRES DE KÉRATINE AU MOYEN D'ACIDE OXO-ÉTHANOÏQUE ET/OU DE DÉRIVÉS DE CELUI-CI[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2016National basic fee paid 
26.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
31.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2018Fee for grant paid
21.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
IE19.12.2018
LU19.12.2018
MT19.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2020/04]AL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
IE19.12.2018
LU19.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2019/51]AL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
IE19.12.2018
LU19.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
Former [2019/48]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
IE19.12.2018
LU19.12.2018
Former [2019/40]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
LU19.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
LU19.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]US2013298933  (MALLE GERARD [FR] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010247800  (WILLEY ALAN DAVID [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [T]FR3006585  (OREAL [FR]) [T] * the whole document *
by applicantWO2009140076
 WO2011060110
 WO2010126919
 WO2013117771
 US4847071
 US5487884
 WO9116035
 WO9116034
 EP2214633
 EP2074986
    - DOMCKE; SOBOLEWSKI, UNRAVELING THE MOLECULAR MECHANISMS OF PHOTOACIDITY, (2003), vol. 302, page 1693
    - KOWALEWSKA, "Photoacid catalyzed sol-gel process", J.MATER. CHEM., (2005), vol. 15, page 4997
 EP20080151246