Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3022824

EP3022824 - CHARGING VOLTAGE CONFIGURING METHOD FOR WIRELESS CHARGING AND WIRELESS POWER RECEPTION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.10.2017  [2017/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/21]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Kyung-Woo
251-503 Olympic Seonsuchon Apt.
1218 Yangjae-daero
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-787 / KR
02 / BYUN, Kang-Ho
901-904 Byeokjeokgol 9-danji Apt.
27 Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-811 / KR
03 / JUNG, Hee-Won
246-1601 Hwanggolmaeul 2-danji Apt.
16 Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR
 [2016/21]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/21]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14825672.018.07.2014
[2016/21]
WO2014KR06529
Priority number, dateKR2013008552719.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130085527
[2016/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015009096
Date:22.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3022824
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015
[2016/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.01.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02J50/80, H02J50/10, H02J7/02, H02J7/04, // H02J50/60, H02J50/40
[2017/12]
Former International [2016/21]H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR LADESPANNUNGSKONFIGURATION FÜR DRAHTLOSES LADEN UND DRAHTLOSE STROMEMPFANGSEINHEIT[2016/21]
English:CHARGING VOLTAGE CONFIGURING METHOD FOR WIRELESS CHARGING AND WIRELESS POWER RECEPTION UNIT[2016/21]
French:MÉTHODE DE CONFIGURATION DE TENSION DE CHARGEMENT POUR CHARGEMENT SANS FIL ET UNITÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL[2016/21]
Entry into regional phase24.12.2015National basic fee paid 
24.12.2015Search fee paid 
24.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/21]
08.09.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013099734  (LEE KYUNG-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0147]; figure 8 *
 [X]  - Texas Instruments, "Highly Integrated Wireless Receiver Qi (WPC V1.1) Compliant Power Supply", (20130331), URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/ds/slusb62/slusb62.pdf, (20170213), XP055344917 [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 17; figure 27 * * page 18; figure 28 *
 [T]  - Texas Instruments, "WIRELESS RECEIVER-SIDE COMMUNICATION AND POWER MONITORING IC FOR WIRELESS POWER (msp430bq1010)", (20101231), URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/msp430bq1010.pdf, (20170213), XP055344804 [T] * page 14 - page 15 *
International search[A]US2013062959  (LEE KEVIN DOUGLAS [US], et al);
 [A]US2013127410  (PARK SUNG-KWEON [KR], et al);
 [A]US2009042525  (RAJAGOPAL SRIDHAR [US], et al);
 [A]US2013154387  (LEE KYUNG-WOO [KR], et al);
 [A]WO2012081749  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al)