Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3078040

EP3078040 - ACOUSTIC NOISE CANCELLATION IN MULTI-LAYER CAPACITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.05.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Change - German titlepublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
24.01.2020Change - French titlepublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2016/41]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOLLER, Jeffrey G.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / UNGAR, P. Jeffrey
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2016/41]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/41]
Application number, filing date14827701.531.12.2014
[2016/41]
WO2014US72978
Priority number, dateUS201461926506P13.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461926506 P
US20141447625003.09.2014         Original published format: US201414476250
[2016/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015105719
Date:16.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3078040
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01G4/012, H01G4/30, H01G4/35, H01G4/38, H01G4/40, H02M1/12, G05F1/10, H01G4/12
[2016/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
TitleGerman:UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON AKUSTISCHEM RAUSCH IN MEHRSCHICHTKONDENSATOREN[2020/09]
English:ACOUSTIC NOISE CANCELLATION IN MULTI-LAYER CAPACITORS[2016/41]
French:SUPRESSION DE BRUIT ACOUSTIQUE DANS DES CONDENSATEURS MULTICOUCHES[2020/09]
Former [2016/41]GERÄUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG IN MEHRSCHICHTIGEN KONDENSATOREN
Former [2016/41]SUPPRESSION DU BRUIT ACOUSTIQUE DANS DES CONDENSATEURS MULTICOUCHES
Entry into regional phase05.07.2016National basic fee paid 
05.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
13.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2008021980  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9]; figures 2,19 * [Y] 6,7,10,11,13,16-18;
 [XYI]US2009244807  (LEE BYOUNG HWA [KR], et al) [X] 8,12 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 65] , [0 66]; claims 1, 32 * [Y] 10,11,13,16-19 [I] 9,14,15;
 [Y]US2013329388  (DOGAUCHI KAZUO [JP]) [Y] 6,7,19 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0 25] *;
 [A]JP2004193352  (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 62] - [0068] *;
 [A]JP2008205135  (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0010] *;
 [A]EP1480236  (MARVELL WORLD TRADE LTD [BB]) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,11,13,15,20 *