Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3231225 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3231225



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 288
07.01.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
26.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
26.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
29.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.06.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
29.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 39
04.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
20.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
20.12.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 28
20.12.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
20.12.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2017 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
20.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.04.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.06.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.06.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 41
21.08.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.08.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.08.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
20.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
20.01.2015 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
11.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
11.12.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
11.12.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 8
11.12.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 28
11.12.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3