Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3084988

EP3084988 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING AN IMAGE SENSOR FOR DECODING HIGH FREQUENCY VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / JOVICIC, Aleksander
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / APPAIAH, Kumar
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / LI, Junyi
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/43]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14828598.412.12.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014US70148
Priority number, dateUS20131410817416.12.2013         Original published format: US201314108174
[2016/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015094986
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3084988
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04B10/69, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N5/235, H04N5/353, H04N5/374, H04N101/00, H04B10/116
[2018/51]
Former International [2016/43]H04B10/116
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES BILDSENSORS ZUR DECODIERUNG HOCHFREQUENTER SICHTBARER LICHTKOMMUNIKATIONSSIGNALE[2016/43]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING AN IMAGE SENSOR FOR DECODING HIGH FREQUENCY VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION SIGNALS[2016/43]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION D'UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGE POUR DÉCODER DES SIGNAUX DE COMMUNICATION PAR LUMIÈRE VISIBLE HAUTE FRÉQUENCE[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2016National basic fee paid 
11.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
25.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/42]
03.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US8334901  (GANICK AARON [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15,17-21,23-25,27-30 * column 8, line 53 - line 58 * * column 19, line 61 - column 20, line 4 * * column 21, line 34 - line 39 * * column 28, line 49 - line 51 * * column 30, line 23 - line 25 * * column 30, line 59 - column 31, line 21 * * column 31, line 41 - line 42 * * column 32, line 6 - line 8 * * figure 30 * [I] 5,11,16,22,26;
 [XI]US2013330088  (OSHIMA MITSUAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,7,10,12-14,18,21,23,24,30 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [1279] * * paragraph [1285] * [I] 4-6,8,9,11,15-17,19,20,22,25-29;
 [A]US2013016978  (SON JAE-SEUNG [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * figure 4 *;
 [A]  - HARUYAMA SHINICHIRO, "Advances in visible light communication technologies", 2012 38TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS, OSA, (20120916), pages 1 - 3, XP032544061 [A] 1-30 * page 2, column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/ECEOC.2012.We.3.B.5